Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3540 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16946 Week
» 69962 Month
» 189489 Year
» 3216342 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
138 |
on |
17/10/1935 |
British Railways |
40138 |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 17/10/1935 to Motherwell (28A) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/09/1962 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/10/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 138 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A) |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40138 |
|
|
03/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
10/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40138 |
|
|
05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|