|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/1961 | Wakefield MPD(56A) | 60140 (56C) was under repair on 26th August; of Wakefield's five passenger turns, four are allocated to Bls and one only to a 2-6-4T with the result that the 2-6-2Ts are out of use but only 40074/147/90 appear to be stored. Two jobs are still worked by 'Jinties', shed pilot and Batley no. 1 (Batley no. 2 is a J50). Wakefield's last two LYR locomotives are 52413/61 in store in the yard. | SLS/196110 |
09/02/1964 | Crewe Works (Scrap Yard) | Scrap Yard: 40147, 42313, 44096, 44216. Traction Shop: D202, D374, D8006, D8054, E3007, 27000. Outside Traction Shop: D201, D272, D1561 painted, D1591, D1592, D1593, D1594 shell only, D6756, D6843, D8050, 92031. Outside Erecting Shop: D300, 42202, 44816, 45140, 45200, 48186, 48268, 92118, 92177. Erecting Shop: D222, D235, D238, D242, D271, D292, D332, D382, D384, D1570 undercoat, D1571 undercoat, D1572 motors mounted, D1573 motors mounted, D1574 motors mounted, D1575 motors mounted, D1576 motors mounted, D1577, D1578, D1579, D1580, D1581, D1582, D1583, D1584, D1585, D1586, D1587, D1588, D1589, D1590 shell only, D5717 (which is the first of the class seen at this works), D6731, D6766, D6848, D6856, D6878, D8010, D8014, D8022, 41272, 42066, 42074, 44762, 44843, 45045, 45109, 45264, 45289, 45368, 48399, 48409, 48495, 48620, 48688, 70001, 70038, 78020, 92099, 92161. Works Yard: D203, D350, 42229, 42463, 44012, 44760, 44831, 44837, 44852, 44918, 45032, 45069, 45075, 45128, 45278, 45464, 45495, 45569, 46490, 46492, 48154, 48394, 48452, 48637, 48668, 48734, 48736, 48753, 73137, 84008, 92129, 92155, 92188. Outside Paint Shop: D246, D250, D327, D369, D1556 painted, D1557 painted, D1558 painted, D1559 painted, D1562 painted. Paint Shop: D1073, D1560, D1563, D1564, D1565, D1566, D1567, D1568, D1569. | SLS/196403 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/08/1937 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 147 Built at Derby Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Trafford Park (LMS) (19G) | ||
03/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 40147 | ||
28/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Royston (20C) | ||
27/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Normanton (20D) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Normanton (20D) | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) | ||
17/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) | ||
29/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Royston (20C) | ||
19/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Normanton (20D) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Manningham (20E) | ||
31/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (56E) | ||
18/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
24/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
19/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 40147 | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |