Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1519 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19322 Week
» 72338 Month
» 191865 Year
» 3218718 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
156 |
on |
06/10/1937 |
British Railways |
40156 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 06/10/1937 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/10/1961 |
Service Life |
24 yrs , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/10/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 156 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Uttoxeter (5F) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40156 |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Uttoxeter (5F) |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warwick (2C) |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
23/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
17/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mansfield (16C) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B) |
|
|
28/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40156 |
|
|
09/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|