Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3448 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16854 Week
» 69870 Month
» 189397 Year
» 3216250 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
162 |
on |
10/11/1937 |
British Railways |
40162 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 10/11/1937 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/10/1961 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/11/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 162 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bournville (21B) |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (20H) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40162 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (20H) |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hellifield (20G) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
28/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40162 |
|
|
01/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|