Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 95 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17898 Week
» 70914 Month
» 190441 Year
» 3217294 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
167 |
on |
07/12/1937 |
British Railways |
40167 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 07/12/1937 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/10/1961 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 10 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
07/12/1937 |
14B |
|
Kentish Town |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
15E |
|
Leicester (G.C.) |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/10/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
5w/e |
31/01/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
28/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1961 |
Leicester GC |
V2s 60815/50/63/90 have been placed in store and replaced by Bls 61077/1177/1206. B1 61381 an 40167 are also in store here. |
SLS/196201 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/12/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 167 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40167 |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) |
|
|
28/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40167 |
|
|
07/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|