Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4054 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17460 Week
» 70476 Month
» 190003 Year
» 3216856 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
41321 |
m/e |
02/1952 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 02/1952 to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
Withdrawal |
Fri 02/07/1965 |
Service Life |
13 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/01/1961 |
Market Harborough MPD |
The sub shed of Leicester is supplied with two engines for its two turns viz. Welham shunt (Class 4F) and Ivatt 2-6-2T for Seaton workings; 41321 has been working this latter turn and leaves shed at 7-05 a.m. for Seaton. Locomotives on shed on 29th January were 41321, 43949, 44242/9, 44716, 46445, 48010/36/529/671 an 90554. |
SLS/196103 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 41321 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
26/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (6K) |
|
|
05/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D) |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warwick (2C) |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
22/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
02/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41321 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |
|
|