08/09/1949 |
Manchester London Road Station |
Fowler 2-6-4T No. 42355 was noted at London Road Statlon on 8/9, painted black and fully lined and with the new crest on the tank sides. Class '4M.T.' No. 43042 was noted in similar livery near Broadheath (Altrincham) on the same date. A smart little piece of running was noted on 6/9 by 'Jubilee' No. 5740 Munster. Although arriving at Stockport on time with the 8.35 a.m. ex-Euston, the slow station work here made a three minutes late departure from the latter. Extremely fast and unchecked running resulted in a three minutes early arrival at London Road, Manchester. |
SLS/194910 |
12/07/1961 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D214/7/36, D2503, D3017, D5034, 13119. Diesel Test House: D41, D100, D230/2, 10203, 11114. New Shunter Test House: D3181, New Building : D38, D43-D49, D139-D141. Finishing Shop: D42, D138, D220. Erecting Shop: D3058, 12069, 13122, 42082, 42178, 42334/55/74/8/85, 42411, 42501/2, 43947, 44053, 44135, 44203, 44598, 47207, 47531, 48011, 48193, 48339. 48729. 73127. New Paint Shop: D39, D40, MR1000, D2501, 42075. 47357, 73067. In Works Sidings : D3016, 12000, 13250, 41532, 41835, 42307/49, 42506/10/23/31, 42697, 43427, 43846, 43905, 44232, 44566, 46150 (returned to its birthplace!), 47268, 47393, 48211, 48312, 48469; 58850, 75050. Bone Yard: Cecil Raikes, 42332, 42507. |
SLS/196108 |
14/08/1961 |
Derby MPD (17A) (Ex Works on Shed) |
Ex Works on Shed: D42, 42355, 42502, 44232, 44566, 47207. |
SLS/196109 |
04/01/1962 |
Derby Works (Works Sidings) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D122, D2220, D2502/4, D2904/9, D5015/6/9, D8016/37, 11155, 44211 (for painting). New Building: D154/5 (engines in), D156-61 (bodywork complete), D162-4 (Body shells only). Finishing Shop: D74, D99, D152/3, D2503. Erecting Shop: 12062/88, 12101, 13169/74, 42236, 42313, 42416, 41826, 43925/63/71, 44156, 44200, 44411, 47161, 47257/79, 47349, 47587, 47664/71, 48117. 48293, 48392, 48495. 73133. 75019/31. New Paint Shop: D151, M R. 1000 (sheeted), 44043, 47307/22. 48061. Works Sidings: D72, D98, D101, D111, D126, ED3, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42328/30/2/55/63/95, 42404/12/48, 42510/21/4/34/88, 43295, 43368, 43658, 43832, 47218, 47444, 48775, 58174/5. LNW 2650. Shunters : D2377/81/83. 47000. |
SLS/196202 |
16/12/1963 |
Crewe Works (Yard) |
Paint Shop: 49395, D252/8, D1031, D1550/1, D1554-7, 26056. Outside: 44671/86, 45072/139/491, 45736, 46452, 48255/411/632, 70025, 73128, 77002, 78028, D229, D287, D356/74, D1032/3, D1552/3. Weigh House: 45327. Yard: 42355, 44714/919, 45006/19/308/75/406/38, 46142, 46448, 48219/415/8, 78023, 92034/67/90/114, D338. Electric Traction Shop: D202, D8006, 26016, 27002. Erecting Shop: 42076, 44726/856/900/32/58, 45003/280/96/316,, 48128/412/614/48/706, 73127, 78033/64, 84013, 92011/24/81/111/128/59/83, D221, D280/8/9/93/4, D301/14/45/69/85/92, D6758, D8024/67. New Construction: D1034 an D1558-75. Outside: 44676, 46143 and 42441remains. Cut-up Shop: 42785 an 90338. |
SLS/196401 |