23/02/1950 |
Derby Works |
New work: On 23/2 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42137-39 were complete-No, 42137 being in the Paint Shop-No, 42140 had the frames and cylinders erected and No. 42141 only the frames. New diesels Nos. 12067/68 were complete, while No. 12067 was noted in the Paint Shop-painted, with crest. Locomotives entering Works during: january: These included Nos. 40046, 49, 40322, 436, 490, 512, 40518/33, 540, 40553/59, 40601, 698, 40927, 937, 1043, 41057/76/81, 1112, 41114, 1252, 1425, 41532, 1686, 1711/20/26, 1835, 41873, 2306, 42320/46, 2365, 42392, 42405, 42504/07/13/25, 3228, 43329, 3429/53/94, 3605/20/55/60, 3714/24, 3804/13/30/67, 44017/47, 44131, 44262, 4423, 44466, 4468, 44482, 4522, 4557/81, 4820, 45305, 48205, 13806, 22984, W.R. No. 2112. On 5/1 No. 42363 was noted in the Paint Shop, fitted with outside steam pipes. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40045, 40163, 40553, 40634, 40917, 41094, 41166/74/88, 42310/63. In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos. 41682, 41711, 41859, 43431, 43524, 43658/60, 43714/23, 43917/50/64, 44423, 44601, 47409/21/99, 47528/51, 47623/31, while Nos. 40059, 40395, 40518, 40698, 41043, 41533, 41686, 42341/59/80, 42524/28, 43228, 43724, 43847, 43944, 47241, 47438, 53806 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 6/1 No. 40459; W/E 13/1 Nos. 1768, 7058, 9588; W/E 20/1 No.2100; W/E 27/1 No. 3813. Nos, 490, 512, an 3830 were also cut up during January, while No. 9573 was in the process of being cut up on 27/1. |
SLS/195003 |
28/02/1950 |
Derby Works |
New work: On 31/3 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42140/41 were complete-No. 42140 being in the Paint Shop-No. 42142 had the frames and boiler erected and Nos. 42143/44 only the frames. Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 40419/86/95, 525/28, 40541, 628, 40633, 40910/35. 936, 41006/35/54/94, 41157/88/96/97, 41247, 1747, 1820, 42324, 2367/70/90, 42516/27/28, 3178/80, 3223/33, 3357/70/88, 3405, 3634/39, 43803/45, 3863, 43865/86, 43912, 3931/48/51, 43970, 3971, 4012/35/37, 44053, 4104, 44129, 4157/69, 44184/85, 44260, 44523, 4538, 44552/82, 4591, 45585, 7252, 22940, 58100, E.R. No. 8002, W.R. Nos. 2089, 2134/36. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with crest, were Nos. 40029, 40540, 40633, 41076. 41112, 42306/65, 58088. The following also carry the crest: Nos. 41531. 41747, 41835. 43370, 43804, 44432/66, 47253, 47336, 47402/62, 47627/30, W.R. Nos. 2023, 2112, while Nos. 40015/34/47, 40937, 42346/92, 42405, 42507/12/25, 43180, 43223/28, 43605, 43863/67, 44053, 44104 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' Nos. 58160 an 58299 appeared painted black, with plain tenders. Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 10/2 Nos. 40533 an 1252: W/E 17/2 No. 1366. |
SLS/195004 |
17/10/1958 |
Derby Works (Paint shop) |
17th October, 1958. Paint shop-42392 G, 42525 G, 48008 G, 75043 G, 80043 G, D3553/4 (new-Order D658), D5002 (new-order B251). Diesel Erecting Shop- 10202/3, 12090, 15004, D3555-3564 (new-order D658), outside- 10201. Test House- D5001, D5700. Erecting Shop, No. 1 bay- 41157 I, 42324 G, 42328 G, 42502 G, 42508 G, 42524 G, 44082 G, 44304 G, 44516 G, 47674 G, 48305 G, 48324 G, 48332 G, 73023 I, 75040 G. Stripping- 44466, 48363, 80060 an 80144. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay- 42367 I, 47589 G, 48530 G, 48617 I, 80143 I; Stripping- 40694, 42513 an 44137. Yard- 40047, 40680/931, 41167, 42370/513, 43231/301/522/815, 47309, 12096 an 15000. |
SLS/195811 |
12/03/1963 |
Derby Works (Works yard) |
D42, D78, D82, D99, D107, D117/9, D120/1, D5027/88, D5393. Outside: D5002/18, D5189. Test House: D48, D113/8, D3372, D5136/87/8/91/2/3. Diesel Finishing Shop: D70, D5010, D5194/5/6. Paint Shop: D5190. Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 43637, 44393, 48619, 73045, 75061, D8, D2913, D3020, D5012, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay: D54, D109, D5083/4; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay: D5197-D5210 new. Works yard: 40026, 42392/422/72/500, 42784, 44004/112, 44228 frames, 44519, 47003, 47276, 58138, 73159, u60093, D64, D94, D111, D130, D5005/31. Stored outside Works offices: 10000/201/2/3. |
SLS/196304 |
30/04/1963 |
Oswestry Works (Works yard) |
Oswestry Works in April contained ex GSWR 0-6-0T ex Hafod Colliery (NBL 21621 of 1917). |
SLS/196304 |