Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3915 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13489 Week
» 78443 Month
» 281107 Year
» 3307960 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2454 |
on |
06/08/1936 |
British Railways |
42454 |
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 06/08/1936 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/12/1962 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 4 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Wed 09/01/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/08/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2454 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42454 |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
23/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
09/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42454 |
|
|
09/01/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|