Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1389 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19192 Week
» 72208 Month
» 191735 Year
» 3218588 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2485 |
on |
11/03/1937 |
British Railways |
42485 |
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 11/03/1937 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 08/06/1963 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 2 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Fri 14/06/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26A |
Newton Heath |
5w/e |
06/05/1961 |
ALLOC |
27C |
Southport |
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/06/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/03/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2485 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
02/07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42485 |
|
|
15/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (27C) |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42485 |
|
|
14/06/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|