Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2072 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15478 Week
» 68494 Month
» 188021 Year
» 3214874 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2538 |
on |
11/12/1935 |
British Railways |
42538 |
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Mon 11/12/1935 to Stoke (5D) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 18/06/1962 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sun 04/11/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/12/1935 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Watford (1C) |
|
|
11/12/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2538 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
11/04/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Watford (1C) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aston (3D) |
|
|
08/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42538 |
|
|
03/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
11/09/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
12/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
17/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shoeburyness (33C) (on paper only) |
|
|
18/06/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42538 |
|
|
04/11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|