Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 520 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19431 Week
» 84385 Month
» 287049 Year
» 3313902 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2548 |
on |
01/07/1936 |
British Railways |
42548 |
w/e |
01/01/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/07/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2548 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24304 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Accrington (24A) |
|
|
01/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42548 |
|
|
22/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Accrington (24A) |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
04/02/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42548 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|