Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 4296 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17702 Week
» 70718 Month
» 190245 Year
» 3217098 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2554 |
on |
16/07/1936 |
British Railways |
42554 |
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/07/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2554 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24310 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D) |
|
|
05/02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42554 |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
21/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (9K) |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42554 |
|
|
07/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|