Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 170 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17973 Week
» 70989 Month
» 190516 Year
» 3217369 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2564 |
on |
18/08/1936 |
British Railways |
42564 |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/08/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2564 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24320 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
12/11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42564 |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
29/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
26/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
25/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
09/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
11/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Uttoxeter (5F) |
|
|
15/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
08/05/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42564 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|