Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1672 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19475 Week
» 72491 Month
» 192018 Year
» 3218871 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2568 |
on |
02/09/1936 |
British Railways |
42568 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Mon 18/02/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/09/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2568 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24324 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42568 |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (14D) |
|
|
25/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Scottish Region (91X) |
|
|
08/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (14D) |
|
|
12/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rowsley (17C) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) |
|
|
06/10/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rowsley (17C) |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42568 |
|
|
18/02/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|