Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 66 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17869 Week
» 70885 Month
» 190412 Year
» 3217265 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2570 |
on |
02/09/1936 |
British Railways |
42570 |
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/09/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2570 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24326 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barrow in Furness (11B) |
|
|
03/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
27/08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42570 |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Macclesfield (9C) |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42570 |
|
|
11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|