Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1462 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19265 Week
» 72281 Month
» 191808 Year
» 3218661 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2576 |
on |
17/09/1936 |
British Railways |
42576 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Thu 13/09/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/09/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2576 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24332 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A) |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42576 |
|
|
12/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
11/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (8E) |
|
|
08/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
25/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
17/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shoeburyness (33C) (on paper only) |
|
|
18/06/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42576 |
|
|
13/09/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|