Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2627 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16033 Week
» 69049 Month
» 188576 Year
» 3215429 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2601 |
on |
24/11/1936 |
British Railways |
42601 |
w/e |
23/04/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/11/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2601 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24357 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
23/04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42601 |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
29/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (14D) |
|
|
05/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
11/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
09/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42601 |
|
|
09/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|