|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/11/1964 | Crewe South MPD (Waiting Works) | Ex-Works: 45392, 48458, 48721/45, 92231; Waiting Works: 42468, 42588, 42616, 44773, 45300, 45733, 47354, 47467, 46499, 48001, 48385, 48505, 48697, 48708, 70001/39, 80125, 92160; Stored: 43151, 45553, 45586; Also on shed: 5063, 6819/77, 7023, 7914. | SLS/196412 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/02/1937 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2616 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24372 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Aston (3D) | ||
25/09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42616 | ||
08/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Preston (24K) | ||
15/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (3D) | ||
12/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
02/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (3D) | ||
25/02/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
08/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bangor (6H) | ||
16/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Watford (1C) | ||
03/04/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
26/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stoke (5D) | ||
24/07/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) | ||
12/02/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) | ||
27/05/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) | ||
17/06/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
10/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42616 | ||
03/1968 | Scrapped | Scrapped |