|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/12/1960 | Horwich Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: 40173, 43023, 44125, 44262, 44602, 48084/9, 48130/88/97, 48249/54, 48457/69, 48664, 48747, 49505, 51498, 52305. Cutting-up Yard: 51227, 52139/79, 52445/52. Erecting Shop: Frames for three new diesel shunters, 12010, 40089, 40120/48, 42649, 42701/59/60/71/85, 42859, 43047, 43122, 43931, 44018 (marked to be cut-up), 44292, 44309/41, 44458, 48082, 48152/9/63, 48247/74, 48340, 48709/21, 76078/85. Paint Shop: uM28341/83M, F.R.3, L.Y.R. 1008. Works Shunters: 11304/5/24/68, 47402, 51429. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/12/1938 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2649 Built at Derby Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Bacup (26E) | ||
08/10/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42649 | ||
06/11/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bury (26D) | ||
29/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) | ||
14/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
18/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
31/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Derby (16C) | ||
06/02/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42649 | ||
10/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |