Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 250 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14293 Week
» 79247 Month
» 281911 Year
» 3308764 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2653 |
m/e |
12/1940 |
British Railways |
42653 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 12/1940 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/09/1962 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Mon 11/03/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1940 |
26C |
|
Bolton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
29/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1940 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2653 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bolton (26C) |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42653 |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42653 |
|
|
11/03/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|