13/01/1951 |
Derby Works |
During the period ended 13/1/51, the following unrenumbered engines have appeared for Works: for special examination, 1377 (19B) and 530 (22B); for attention, 7236 (19A), 7502 (18D), 3392 (20B), 22944 (16A), 7165 (28B), 7572 (25A), 3679 (84G). Cut up, 20155 (14/12). New 2-6-4T on trial, 42065 . 10000, 10001 an 10800 were receiving attention in the diesel shop. Apart from the usual Derby types, the following were in evidence: 64714 (39A), 64730 (40A), 64832 (38A), 64967 (37A), 2043 (LYD), 64783 (30A), 64836 (37A), also the following 'outsiders'-42502 (33C), 42509/29/30 (33A), 43757 (84G), 47479 (87K), 40482 an 43957 (35C), 41824 (87K), 42506 (33A), 42385 (87K). The following came off still lettered 'British Railways'-42388, 64727, 41853 (round-top firebox), 47576, 42342, 41905 (lined); and others still 'L.M.S.' !! 41534, 44186, 41196, 42533, 40032, 47503, 44339, 40928, 42387, 42530, 43627, 44103 (after three years of British Railways). No. 10100 was on trial on 9/1/51, when 10000/1 were still in the diesel shop. The following are stored near the station: 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361, 43429. Old engines fresh off works include 2053 and 2112 (0-6-0PT), 40454, 40463, 43627, 43790, 58062, 58159, 58162. Those repainted with emblem include 64734, 64805/41/93 an 43846 with a L.M.S. standard 0-8-0 tender. |
SLS/195102 |
13/01/1951 |
Derby Works |
During the period ended 13/1/51, the following unrenumbered engines have appeared for Works: for special examination, 1377 (19B) and 530 (22B); for attention, 7236 (19A), 7502 (18D), 3392 (20B), 22944 (16A), 7165 (28B), 7572 (25A), 3679 (84G). Cut up, 20155 (14/12). New 2-6-4T on trial, 42065 . 10000, 10001 an 10800 were receiving attention in the diesel shop. Apart from the usual Derby types, the following were in evidence: 64714 (39A), 64730 (40A), 64832 (38A), 64967 (37A), 2043 (LYD), 64783 (30A), 64836 (37A), also the following 'outsiders'-42502 (33C), 42509/29/30 (33A), 43757 (84G), 47479 (87K), 40482 an 43957 (35C), 41824 (87K), 42506 (33A), 42385 (87K). The following came off still lettered 'British Railways'-42388, 64727, 41853 (round-top firebox), 47576, 42342, 41905 (lined); and others still 'L.M.S.' !! 41534, 44186, 41196, 42533, 40032, 47503, 44339, 40928, 42387, 42530, 43627, 44103 (after three years of British Railways). No. 10100 was on trial on 9/1/51, when 10000/1 were still in the diesel shop. The following are stored near the station: 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361, 43429. Old engines fresh off works include 2053 and 2112 (0-6-0PT), 40454, 40463, 43627, 43790, 58062, 58159, 58162. Those repainted with emblem include 64734, 64805/41/93 an 43846 with a L.M.S. standard 0-8-0 tender. |
SLS/195102 |
30/09/1951 |
3 cylinder tank trials |
The 3-cyl. 2-6-4T 42530 has been tried out in the Glasgow area, and so far has been successful on its various test trains. Probably more will now come North for the Ayrshire routes. |
SLS/195111 |
04/11/1951 |
3 cylinder 2-6-4T\'s in Scotland |
Regarding the arrival of 3 cylinder 2-6-4's in West of Scotland, the first to arrive was 42535, still with L.M.S. on tanks which was sent to Ardrossan, though bearing 67A shed plate. It ran on the morning Express from Largs to Glasgow for about 5-6 weeks, until so many protests were made, including letters to the daily papers, that it was taken off, and returned to 67A, 42212 being sent back to 67D. 42535 was unable to do the 42 mile run without an emergency stop for water, which lost time every day. Apart from that, it seemed good enough. We believe it is now at 66D. We have never seen 42530 out of St. Enoch. |
SLS/195201 |
03/07/1958 |
Derby Works (Paint shop) |
Paint shop- 42310 G, 42530 I, 43991 I, 44044 G, 48056 G, 48419 I, 48644 G, D3529 (No. 27-new), D3530 (No. 28). Diesel erecting shop- 12066 G, 15004 Casual, D8015 Casual, new work (order no. D658) no. 29 (D3531) on test, nos. 30-39 (D3532-41) all engines mounted, nos. 46-50 (D3548-52) frames in stocks. Erecting shop (no. 2 bay)- 42308 I, 42528 G, 43514 G, 43822 G, 43906 I, 43932 I, 47535 I, 47660 I, 48694 G; Erecting shop (no. 1 bay)- 40010 G, 42336 G, 42348 G, 42373 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42391 G, 42541 G, 42680 I, 43459 I, 44288 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 75037 G, 75047 G, stripping- 42536 I, 47289 I, 47552 G; Erecting shop (no. 3 bay)-, new work Diesel main line-D5001-7 new (nos. 2-8) engines mounted on D5001-3; D1, D2 new (nos. 1 & 2) framework only. Yard- 40047, 40657, 40680, 42322, 42506/25/29, 44135/46/61, 44290, 47504, 53807, 58196, 75034, D8000, D5000. M.R. 118 has returned from Carlisle. |
SLS/195807 |
09/01/1961 |
Derby Works (Works Sidings) |
Diesel Erecting Shop, ED2/4/6, D2508, D2902, D5086, D5705/11, D8008, 10800, 11117, 12058/89, 13126/171/5. Test House: D18, D229, D3368/568, D5146/7, D8001. New Building: D21-D28, D5085. Finishing Shop: D17, D20, D3022, D5134/49. Erecting Shop: 41537, 42067/91, 42254/388/511/8, 43969/77, 44182/209/540/51, 44843, 47164/231, 48132/41/223/61/315/83/495/766, 92091. Paint Shop: D19, M1000, 42071, 47359/92, 48007. In Works Sidings: 40028, 42076, 42300/97/439/530/9, 43194, 43572/4/954, 44167/268, 47212/347/401, 48386, 48619/89, 58850, 73045, 92129. |
SLS/196102 |