30/04/1950 |
Derby Works |
Nos. 46100 an 46155 are being converted to taper-boiler 'Scots.' New Work. On 19/5, 2-6-4 tanks Nos. 42143/4 were complete (the latter in the Paint Shop), and frames for the next two were erected. New 2-6-4 tanks for the Ulster Transport Authority were also in progress. No. 54 had the boiler and tanks mounted, and the frames of Nos. 55 and 56 were in position. Entering Works during April: These included Nos. 377, 526, 40537, 40675, 41003/09/21/23/34/47/51/84, 1085, 41094, 1158, 1699, 1773/79/80, 1814, 42327/74/88, 42500/16/31/34, 2992, 43211, 3313/42/94, 3401/08, 43411, 3457, 43660, 3833/44, 43857/58/69, 3946, 43976, 44050, 4066, 44163, 44216,4313, 44316, 4432/34, 44394, 44555, 4605, 58137, 58283, W.R. No. 2156. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40014/42/48, 40418, 41073, 42348/60/86/97. In addition. the following also carry the crest: Nos. 43401, 43507/95/98, 43832, 43962, 44092, 44153, 44273, 44532/78, 53807, 58121, 58214, 47212, 47345, 47448, W.R. Nos. 2134/36/86, while Nos. 40037/40, 40417, 40557, 40675, 40930, 41014/91/97, 41158, 41727, 42305, 42407., 42505/35, 43342, 43810/33/58/70, 43940, 44434, 47400/66, 47587 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' 58214 is believed to be the first Class '2F' to receive the crest. Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: w/e 14/4 No. 1322; w/e 21/4 Nos. 561, 3408. Stored locomotives: On 28/4 Nos. 404, 40411/16, 41059 were noted stored near the station. |
SLS/195006 |
13/05/1959 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop, no. 2 bay) |
Paint shop-44467G, 44603 G, 48186 I, 48405 G, 73030 I, 73032 G, 12092, D3767/8 New; Diesel Erecting shop-10202, 12053, ED4/5, D3085, D3491, D5702; New Work-8 d/e shunters 0-6-0 (D3769-76). Test House-D5015/6/7, D3124; Diesel Finishing Shop-D5018, D1 Scafell Pike, D2 Helvellyn; Erecting Shop, no. 1 bay-42375I, 42505 I, 42641 I, 44036 G, 44092 G, 44097 G, 44195 I, 44206 I, 44213 G, 44387 G, 44582 G, 47255 G, 47378 I, 47442 G, 48088 I, 48374 G, 48636 G, 48673 I, 73136 I, 75005 I; Erecting Shop, no. 1 bay - stripping-52532, 43982, 44049, 44211. Erecting Shop, no. 2 bay-41000 (Boiler RBS 5240 no, 12594, type G9 ex 40928; present state-6 frame inserts, boiler in, motion and slide bars in partly, driving splashers and footplate supports fitted), 42508 I, 42531 I, 44188 I, 44414 I, 47414 I, 73132 I; Erecting Shop, no. 2 bay - stripping-73144; Erecting Shop, no. 3 bay-4 2300 H.P. 1-Co-Co-1 (D3-6), 6 1160 H.P. Bo-Bo (D5019-24); Yard-40047, 40680, 43205/54, 42541, 42661, 44588, 45032, 47309, 48111, 48385, 48643, 53806, 58281, 10100, 10800, Cecil Raikes. Stored locos. moved into Wks. yard-40931, 41068, 41119/63/4/7/93, 43231/301/441/522/745 an 43815. Stored locos, by side of Test House-40412/536, 41062, 41857 an 47214. |
SLS/195906 |
12/07/1961 |
Derby Works (In Works Sidings ) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D214/7/36, D2503, D3017, D5034, 13119. Diesel Test House: D41, D100, D230/2, 10203, 11114. New Shunter Test House: D3181, New Building : D38, D43-D49, D139-D141. Finishing Shop: D42, D138, D220. Erecting Shop: D3058, 12069, 13122, 42082, 42178, 42334/55/74/8/85, 42411, 42501/2, 43947, 44053, 44135, 44203, 44598, 47207, 47531, 48011, 48193, 48339. 48729. 73127. New Paint Shop: D39, D40, MR1000, D2501, 42075. 47357, 73067. In Works Sidings : D3016, 12000, 13250, 41532, 41835, 42307/49, 42506/10/23/31, 42697, 43427, 43846, 43905, 44232, 44566, 46150 (returned to its birthplace!), 47268, 47393, 48211, 48312, 48469; 58850, 75050. Bone Yard: Cecil Raikes, 42332, 42507. |
SLS/196108 |
14/08/1961 |
Derby Works (In Works Sidings) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D223/33, D2503, D3017, D5025, D5134/5. Diesel Test House: D43, D220, D3053, D5144, 12092. Shunter Test House: 12069. New Building: D46-D49, D138-D143. Finishing Shop: D44/5, D226/88, D8010. Erecting Shop: D3016/58, 13122, 13250, 42082, 42178, 42374, 42523, 42697, 44123, 44215, 44380, 44528, 47345/85/93, 48004/24, 48211, 48312/24/82, 48469, 48621, 48729, 73127. Paint Shop: MR1000, 42501, 44135, 44203, 48193. In Works Sidings: D230, 12000/96, D2501, 41532, 41835, 42307/49/60, 42415, 42506/10/31, 43846, 43905, 44171, 44278, 44527, 47268, 47629/62, 48218, 48765, 58850, 73125, 75050. |
SLS/196109 |
19/09/1961 |
Derby Works (In Works Sidings) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D99, D211, D2503, D2908, D5023/88, D5144, D8014, 11146, 13248. Diesel Test House: D1, D48, D90, D2913, D5075. New Building: D46, D139-D147. Finishing Shop: D21/2, D49, D93, D138, D8015. Erecting Shop: 12096, 13122/76, 41804, 42198, 42211, 42408, 43599, 43645, 43964, 44572, 47207, 47272, 47308/27, 47450/94, 47602/29, 48225/79, 53809, 73010/38/71, 73125/30, 75018/32. Paint Shop: D47, D100 (re-varnished and named Sherwood Forester). In Works Sidings: Cecil Raikes, D44, D2501, D2909, 10202/3, 12000, 41168, 42282, 42283, 42328/49/74, 42510/21/4/31, 43905, 47268, 47432, 47611, 48001, 58850, 75017/34. |
SLS/196110 |