28/04/1950 |
Derby Works |
New work: On 28/4 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42142/43 were complete-No. 42142 being in the Paint Shop-No. 42144 had the frames and cylinders erected and No. 42145 only the frames. New diesel No. 12069 was complete. The frames were erected for the first two of a batch of new 2-6-4T's for the Ulster Transport Authority. Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 10000, 12023, 15100, 40417, 453, 40484, 502/03, 40516, 557, 40658. 659, 40926, 930, 41014/44/52, 1073, 41075/91/97, 1118/50, 41166/95, 1303, 1727, 1855, 42305/07/34/36, 2348, 42360/86/97, 2407, 42413, 42505/11/18/32/33/35, 3090, 3187, 43228, 3254, 3379, 43388/89, 43482, 3507/22/50/95/98, 3773, 3810/32/52, 43870/79. 43940, 3962, 4005/92, 4153, 44176, 4273, 44275, 4289, 44298, 44403/12/25, 4532/63, 44570, 4578, 44584, 44667, 13807, 58041, 58198, 22913, ED1, W.R. Nos. 2039, 2186. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40056, 40628, 41035, 42324/90, 58056, 58100 (ex 2290). In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos. 41532, 41820/55, 43370, 43639, 43773/91, 43970, 44012, 44260/89, 44532/38/70, 47212/53/89, 47308/50, 47436, 47525/65, 47626/30/54, W.R. No. 2134, while Nos. 40453/95, 40502/25/28/57, 40659, 41054, 41118/57/96, 42336, 42516/28, 43178/87, 43232/33/54/88, 43379/88/89, 43845, 44005/37, 44169/76, 44563, 47524/32, 47638, 58198 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' W.R. No. 2089 has been painted green and lettered 'British Railways.' Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 10/3 Nos. 3477, 3533, 22940; W/E 31/3 Nos, 40745, 1895, 3772, 22976. |
SLS/195005 |
30/04/1950 |
Derby Works |
Nos. 46100 an 46155 are being converted to taper-boiler 'Scots.' New Work. On 19/5, 2-6-4 tanks Nos. 42143/4 were complete (the latter in the Paint Shop), and frames for the next two were erected. New 2-6-4 tanks for the Ulster Transport Authority were also in progress. No. 54 had the boiler and tanks mounted, and the frames of Nos. 55 and 56 were in position. Entering Works during April: These included Nos. 377, 526, 40537, 40675, 41003/09/21/23/34/47/51/84, 1085, 41094, 1158, 1699, 1773/79/80, 1814, 42327/74/88, 42500/16/31/34, 2992, 43211, 3313/42/94, 3401/08, 43411, 3457, 43660, 3833/44, 43857/58/69, 3946, 43976, 44050, 4066, 44163, 44216,4313, 44316, 4432/34, 44394, 44555, 4605, 58137, 58283, W.R. No. 2156. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40014/42/48, 40418, 41073, 42348/60/86/97. In addition. the following also carry the crest: Nos. 43401, 43507/95/98, 43832, 43962, 44092, 44153, 44273, 44532/78, 53807, 58121, 58214, 47212, 47345, 47448, W.R. Nos. 2134/36/86, while Nos. 40037/40, 40417, 40557, 40675, 40930, 41014/91/97, 41158, 41727, 42305, 42407., 42505/35, 43342, 43810/33/58/70, 43940, 44434, 47400/66, 47587 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' 58214 is believed to be the first Class '2F' to receive the crest. Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: w/e 14/4 No. 1322; w/e 21/4 Nos. 561, 3408. Stored locomotives: On 28/4 Nos. 404, 40411/16, 41059 were noted stored near the station. |
SLS/195006 |
04/11/1951 |
3 cylinder 2-6-4T\'s in Scotland |
Regarding the arrival of 3 cylinder 2-6-4's in West of Scotland, the first to arrive was 42535, still with L.M.S. on tanks which was sent to Ardrossan, though bearing 67A shed plate. It ran on the morning Express from Largs to Glasgow for about 5-6 weeks, until so many protests were made, including letters to the daily papers, that it was taken off, and returned to 67A, 42212 being sent back to 67D. 42535 was unable to do the 42 mile run without an emergency stop for water, which lost time every day. Apart from that, it seemed good enough. We believe it is now at 66D. We have never seen 42530 out of St. Enoch. |
SLS/195201 |
29/12/1951 |
Empty Glasgow Central |
With traffic arrangements as they are during the winter of 1951/2 it is possible to have the unusual sight of platforms Nos. 1-9 inclusive at Central station, Glasgow, completely empty at a few minutes past two in the afternoon (Saturdays excepted). The 1.40 p.m. local from Busby is due at 2.3 p.m., and at 2.0 p.m. an outer Cathcart Circle leaves platform 7, while the 12.56 p.m. from Law Junction is just completing station duties at platform 3. At about one minute past two the station pilot leaves with the empty stock, usually passing the Busby train on the Clyde Bridge, and by the time the latter train has drawn to a halt at the buffer stops of platform 10 the engines which had brought the Law train in and the stock forming the two o'clock Circle train have been accepted by Bridge Street box and are on their way to Polmadie, so that passengers alighting from the Busby train can gaze across empty platforms to the stone walls beyond platform 1. Other trains in the station are the 1.42 p.m. from Kirkhill at platform 11, and the 2.10 p.m. for Wemyss Bay at platform 12, the latter usually behind 3-cylinder 2-6-4T 42535. |
SLS/195203 |
10/03/1963 |
Doncaster Works (Waiting Works) |
Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. |
SLS/196304 |
11/05/1963 |
Worcester Works (Waiting Works) |
4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. |
SLS/196304 |