Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 852 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14258 Week
» 67274 Month
» 186801 Year
» 3213654 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2685 |
on |
09/07/1945 |
British Railways |
42685 |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 09/07/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/09/1962 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Fri 04/01/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/07/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2685 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A) |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42685 |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (20E) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournville (21B) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournville (21B) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
27/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (20E) |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
07/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rowsley (17C) |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42685 |
|
|
04/01/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|