|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1949 | St. Rollox Works | Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 40186, 590, 617/27, 41175, 1184, 2195, 2694, 2746, 42809, 2831, 4794, 44960/92, 45007/09/87, 45123/24/38, 45389, 45452/69, 45471/72/82/86/92, 46221, 14472, 15140, 15213, 16243/59, 56261, 16306/53/55, 17246, 17339/64, 57556, 17602/26/40/68. St. Rollox have now started using the B.R. crest, but as yet none of the ex-C.R. locomotives has received one. Two of the diesel railcars are laid up at St. Rollox, and the third at Hamilton. It is rumoured that one is to be broken up | SLS/194912 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1945 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2694 Built at Derby Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Polmadie (27A) | ||
12/11/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42694 | ||
22/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) | ||
06/07/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) | ||
22/08/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D) | ||
29/05/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carstairs (66E) | ||
10/12/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42694 | ||
04/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle |