|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/1949 | St. Rollox Works | Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 40570/73, 40621, 40907, 909, 41177, 2688, 42689, 2695, 42699, 2800/50, 42906, 3922, 44193, 4792, 44924, 4957, 44979/98, 45008/11/49, 45119/20/25/56/61/76, 45213/66, 45361, 45459, 5473, 45644/46/93, 45714/15/32, 47540, 14451/83, 54506, 54648, 15139, 55359, 16163/73, 16326/56/70/73, 17240/85, 17311, 57372, 57604/19, 17671, 17950. (14451's built-up chimney now removed). | SLS/194911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1945 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2695 Built at Derby Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Polmadie (27A) | ||
22/10/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42695 | ||
22/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
02/08/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
30/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) | ||
19/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
08/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42695 | ||
09/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |