Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 867 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19778 Week
» 84732 Month
» 287396 Year
» 3314249 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2231 |
on |
05/06/1946 |
British Railways |
42231 |
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 05/06/1946 to Southport (23C) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 22/06/1963 |
Service Life |
17 yrs , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/06/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2231 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Southport (23C) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D) |
|
|
11/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42231 |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Albans (14C) |
|
|
23/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Albans (14C) |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plaistow (PLS) |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
18/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42231 |
|
|
09/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|