Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1083 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18886 Week
» 71902 Month
» 191429 Year
» 3218282 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2245 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
42245 |
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 10/1946 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 08/10/1964 |
Service Life |
18 yrs , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1946 |
27A |
|
Polmadie |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
66B |
|
Motherwell |
4w/e |
29/07/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/10/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
66D |
Greenock Ladyburn |
4w/e |
29/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
08/10/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2245 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Polmadie (27A) |
|
|
04/06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42245 |
|
|
29/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
08/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42245 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|