Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 335 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18138 Week
» 71154 Month
» 190681 Year
» 3217534 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2246 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
42246 |
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 10/1946 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 08/06/1964 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1946 |
27A |
|
Polmadie |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/06/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
08/06/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/07/1949 |
Kilmarnock Works |
Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 40636/89, 1125/27, 2246, 42415, 2696, 4328, 14630, 55166, 56282, 16332, 57264, 17383. |
SLS/194908 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2246 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Polmadie (27A) |
|
|
20/08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42246 |
|
|
08/06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42246 |
|
|
09/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|