Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2823 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16229 Week
» 69245 Month
» 188772 Year
» 3215625 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2260 |
on |
07/12/1946 |
British Railways |
42260 |
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Wed 07/12/1946 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 25/05/1966 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 5 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/12/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2260 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bangor (7B) |
|
|
31/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42260 |
|
|
17/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D) |
|
|
29/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Beattock (66F) |
|
|
25/05/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42260 |
|
|
09/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|