Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 1 Online
» 305 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18108 Week
» 71124 Month
» 190651 Year
» 3217504 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2277 |
m/e |
07/1947 |
British Railways |
42277 |
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 07/1947 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 09/08/1966 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 1 mth , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1966 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1947 |
30A |
|
Corkerhill |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
27A |
|
Polmadie |
w/e |
07/02/1948 |
63A |
|
Perth South |
4w/e |
22/01/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
09/08/1966 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
30A |
Corkerhill |
w/e |
12/07/1947 |
ALLOC |
27A |
Polmadie |
w/e |
07/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
63A |
Perth South |
4w/e |
22/01/1955 |
ALLOC |
66A |
Polmadie |
4w/e |
19/03/1955 |
ALLOC |
64G |
Hawick |
4w/e |
19/03/1955 |
ALLOC |
66A |
Polmadie |
4w/e |
16/04/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/08/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1947 |
Corkerhill MPD |
Arrival of further Class 4 tanks were as follows: No. 2276 , Boiler No. 12769 (10/7), No. 2277 , Boiler No. 12770 (19/7). No. 2278 was observed at Manchester as allocated to 26A during W.E. 26/7. No. 648 (30D) the loco. involved in the smash at Elderslie on 20/7 is still lying dead at Corkerhill (4/8). |
SLS/194709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1947 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2277 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Corkerhill (30A) |
|
|
07/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (27A) |
|
|
22/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42277 |
|
|
22/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
09/08/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42277 |
|
|
12/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|