Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3053 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16459 Week
» 69475 Month
» 189002 Year
» 3215855 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2189 |
on |
24/12/1947 |
British Railways |
42189 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 24/12/1947 |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sat 09/09/1967 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
25F |
Low Moor |
w/e |
27/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
55F |
Manningham |
4w/e |
01/10/1960 |
ALLOC |
56A |
Wakefield |
4w/e |
20/05/1967 |
ALLOC |
55E |
Normanton |
4w/e |
15/07/1967 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
09/09/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/12/1947 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2189 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42189 |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (55F) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
15/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (55E) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42189 |
|
|
05/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|