Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2573 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15979 Week
» 68995 Month
» 188522 Year
» 3215375 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2192 |
on |
31/01/1948 |
British Railways |
42192 |
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Mon 31/01/1948 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 11/05/1964 |
Service Life |
16 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
31/01/1948 |
68D |
|
Beattock |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
11/05/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
30A |
Corkerhill |
w/e |
31/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
68D |
Beattock |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/05/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/08/1948 |
Troon Station |
Ex L.N.E.R. locomotives reached Troon on 28/8; the first time known to the Station staff. Two twelve coach (non-corridor) Party Specials from Kirkintilloch were brought in by green 'B.1's' Nos. 1180 an 61336. The engines went to Ayr shed, propelling the coaches to and from Troon Harbour Sidings by the loop line. 'Propelling' on the Main line, as well as on sidings is a daily occurrence here and distances thus covered are not inconsiderable-such as Kilwinning or Irvine to Ayr. Usually a brake van is propelled, but occasionally a small number of wagons are sandwiched in between. Speeds are normal. Owing to the incidence of Specials, 'Caley' 4-4-0's are used intermittently on the Glasgow-Ayr and Kilmarnock-Ayr trains during the Summer timetable period. This has been unknown during the previous two years, except on one or two isolated occasions when there had been a failure or mishap. Between Glasgow and Ayr the 2-6-4T's Nos. 2192-8 have taken the place of most of the aged and ailing 'Compounds.' '5XP' and '5P' 4-6-0's appear to be more numerous. The 'Caley' 4-4-0's keep time and appear to steam easily in so doing. The loads vary from 4-8 non-corridor coaches |
SLS/194810 |
31/01/1950 |
Kilmarnock Works |
Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 40154, 40920, 2192, 42807, 56244, 57279. 17303, 57409, 57583. |
SLS/195003 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/01/1948 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2192 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
11/02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42192 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Beattock (68D) |
|
|
11/05/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42192 |
|
|
09/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|