Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 796 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19707 Week
» 84661 Month
» 287325 Year
» 3314178 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
42147 |
on |
23/04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 23/04/1948 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 01/05/1965 |
Service Life |
17 yrs , 8 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/04/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 42147 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
11/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
08/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) |
|
|
01/05/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42147 |
|
|
08/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|