Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1427 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14833 Week
» 67849 Month
» 187376 Year
» 3214229 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
42183 |
on |
11/01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 11/01/1949 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 01/10/1966 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/01/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 42183 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
17/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (27F) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
17/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
21/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
12/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
20/10/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
25/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (9K) |
|
|
01/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42183 |
|
|
02/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|