Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 938 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18741 Week
» 71757 Month
» 191284 Year
» 3218137 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
42112 |
on |
10/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 10/06/1949 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 24/07/1965 |
Service Life |
16 yrs, 1 mth , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/07/1962 |
Derby MPD |
Ex-Works on Shed : D5003 (1A), 42112 (9E), 42394 (87D), 47395 (8F), 75036 (6G), 75057 (15C). |
SLS/196208 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/06/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 42112 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
23/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (25F) |
|
|
31/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E) |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
10/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
07/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
24/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42112 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|