Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 832 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18635 Week
» 71651 Month
» 191178 Year
» 3218031 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
42120 |
on |
31/08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 31/08/1949 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/09/1963 |
Service Life |
14 yrs , 28 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/08/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 42120 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
28/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Watford (1C) |
|
|
05/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
26/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
23/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11A) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42120 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Dudley Hill |
|
|