Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 710 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14116 Week
» 67132 Month
» 186659 Year
» 3213512 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
42123 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 10/1949 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 28/02/1964 |
Service Life |
14 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1949 |
67D |
|
Ardrossan |
4w/e |
12/03/1960 |
55H |
|
Neville Hill |
w/e |
19/10/1963 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/02/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
67A |
Corkerhill |
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
ALLOC |
67D |
Ardrossan |
4w/e |
12/03/1960 |
ALLOC |
55H |
Neville Hill |
4w/e |
09/11/1963 |
ALLOC |
91NE |
|
4w/e |
09/11/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/02/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 42123 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
12/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
19/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) |
|
|
02/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
28/02/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42123 |
|
|