Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 205 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 23836 Week
» 88790 Month
» 291454 Year
» 3318307 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
42137 |
on |
27/02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 27/02/1950 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 25/01/1964 |
Service Life |
13 yrs, 10 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/02/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 42137 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
26/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (27F) |
|
|
07/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
20/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Uttoxeter (5F) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42137 |
|
|
03/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|