Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 4136 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23047 Week
» 88001 Month
» 290665 Year
» 3317518 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
42139 |
on |
15/03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Mon 15/03/1950 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 27/12/1965 |
Service Life |
15 yrs, 9 mths , 12 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
15/03/1950 |
20E |
|
Manningham |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
55A |
|
Holbeck (MR) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
27/12/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/03/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 42139 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (20E) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
27/12/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42139 |
|
|
03/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|