|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1950 | Brighton Works | Engines under repair include 680s, 30914 Eastbourne, 32082, 32106, 32449, 32482, and 77296/90360. New construction-42070-78 and 34110; the tanks are due out at the rate of one per week commencing with 42070 on 27/10 up to 42078 on 22/12. Addendum: The engines mentioned as under repair were all dealt with during November, and further tanks laid down up to 42084. | SLS/195012 |
31/01/1951 | Brighton Works | Engines recently off works include 32168 (unlined), 42081, 31550 (lined), 34110 66 Squadron. The output is somewhat slowed to approximately three per month, No. 42087 being due off shops on 19th March. Apart from engines frequently stored, and used only occasionally, most of the engines in the Brighton area have been renumbered: the latest is 32342, just through shops and lined black. The smaller size emblem is now generally used for this class. The W.D. 2-8-0 are very infrequent visitors now, several having left the Southern Region altogether. One of the Newhaven 'Terriers,' 2647, with 'Southern' and numerals on the tanks, was on the shed coalstage duty on 18th January. New tanks 42082-3 have been allotted boilers No. 13500/11, working pressure 200lb. (standard). Nos. 42080-3 are at Stewart's Lane in place of No. 42071-4. | SLS/195102 |
12/08/1964 | Crewe South MPD (Awaiting Works) | On Shed Awaiting Works: 42072/267/436, 44667/738/814, 45716, 48056/220/351/365/450, 92098/157. Ex Works: 45344/85, 48468/516/746, 92104. | SLS/196409 |
20/09/1964 | Crewe Works (Paint Shop Yard) | Paint Shop: D1622 painted, D1623 undercoat, D1626 undercoat, D1627 undercoat, D6786, 26049. Arrival Sidings: 42233, 42267, 42651, 42665, 44667, 45031, 45038, 45249, 48050, 48056, 48153, 48205, 48206, 48252, 48267, 48301, 48365, 48558, 48617, 78023, 92157. Works Siding adjacent to Scrap Road: 48069, 48155, 48202, 48310, 48657. Scrap Road: 42092, 48341, 84023. Traction Shop: D338, D371, E3012, 26025, 27004, 27005. Traction Shop Yard: D203, D274, D304, D379, D1646, D1647, D1648, D1649, D1650, D1651 shell, D8055. Erecting Shop Yard: D221, D232, D348, 42115, 48450, 70031. Minor Repair Road: 44688, 45195, 45455. Erecting Shop: D237, D244, D290, D301, D306, D329, D370, D380, D1624 undercoat, D1628 undercoat, D1629 undercoat, D1630 motors mounted, D1631 motors mounted, D1632 motors mounted, D1633, D1634, D1635, D1636, D1637, D1638, D1639, D1640, D1641, D1642, D1643, D1644, D1645 shell, D5706, D6768, D8017, D8056, 42436, 42546, 44664, 44779, 44814, 44835, 45005, 45327, 46487, 48057, 48218, 48247, 48335, 48351, 48356, 48357, 48364, 48435, 48540, 70022, 84015, 84025. Works Yard: 42186, 42421, 42608, 44663, 44715, 44803, 44857, 45103, 45307, 45392, 45716, 46491, 48002, 48024, 48081, 48160, 48334, 48552, 48721, 70033, 70034, 70053, 92024, 92100, 92139, 92206, 92223, 92231. Paint Shop Yard: D213, D276, D283, D354, D1621 painted, D333, D1625 undercoat, D6788, D8045, D8052, 42072, 45112, 45325, 48253, 48548, 48676, 70001, 70009, 70044, 78044. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/11/1950 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 42072 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
||
05/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ashford (74A) | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) | ||
08/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) | ||
13/11/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
20/07/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) | ||
21/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (55G) | ||
19/07/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Manningham (55F) | ||
20/05/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
15/07/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) | ||
09/09/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
10/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42072 | ||
03/1968 | Scrapped | Scrapped |