Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1829 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15235 Week
» 68251 Month
» 187778 Year
» 3214631 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
42083 |
on |
09/02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Fairburn |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
Sat 09/02/1951 to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1967 |
Service Life |
16 yrs, 7 mths , 21 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
22/11/1952 |
North Eastern Miscellany |
On 22nd November last the Green Howards arrived at Barnard Castle for service in Korea; their special was hauled from York by 'V2' No. 60835 (named after the regiment) specially cleaned for the occasion, and was piloted from Darlington to Barney by 'Ll' No. 67792 (being run in ex Works). With the withdrawal on 27/11 of the Kirkby Stephen and Tebay passenger service, Darlington men now run through to Penrith on the 6.18 a.m. and 4.10 p.m. ex Bank Top: as the 2MT's cannot be turned at Penrith, Bank Top now rely on the 'old faithfuls'-super-heated J21 class-to work these for the time being. These old-timers frequently work Saltburn and Richmond turns in company with 'A5's,' 'Ll's' and L.M.R. 2-6-4T's, and one recently worked the, 6.25 a.m. York slow from Bank Top and lost no time. Several drivers prefer these engines to the more modern types for many jobs in this area, they are easy to maintain, light on coal, and very comfortable in riding qualities. No. 45607 Fiji worked a Sheffield-Newcastle football excursion right through on 20.12.1952, leaving Bank Top at 11.40 a.m. Class 4 tanks Nos. 42083/4/5 are ail working in the Bank Top local passenger links. |
SLS/195302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/02/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 42083 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
19/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
19/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
22/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Whitby (50G) |
|
|
11/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
25/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (56E) |
|
|
03/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (55E) |
|
|
10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42083 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|