|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/04/1952 | Newcastle Area | The advent of the Ivatt 2-6-0's of Class 4 has already brought a London Midland flavour to Teesside and Humberside, but on 1st April, 1952, it was the turn of Newcastle (normally an almost exclusive N.E. centre) to savour of Crewe and Derby. Two Class 4 Ivatt 2-6-0's (numbers not identified) were noted in traffic between Durham and Newcastle, whilst at Newcastle Central 42084 (73A) was working the 11.15 a.m. to Middlesbrough via Sunderland and West Hartlepool. Nos. 43016/70 an 43125 were on Heaton Shed, and No. 42085 (73A) was under repair at Gateshead Works. | SLS/195206 |
22/11/1952 | North Eastern Miscellany | On 22nd November last the Green Howards arrived at Barnard Castle for service in Korea; their special was hauled from York by 'V2' No. 60835 (named after the regiment) specially cleaned for the occasion, and was piloted from Darlington to Barney by 'Ll' No. 67792 (being run in ex Works). With the withdrawal on 27/11 of the Kirkby Stephen and Tebay passenger service, Darlington men now run through to Penrith on the 6.18 a.m. and 4.10 p.m. ex Bank Top: as the 2MT's cannot be turned at Penrith, Bank Top now rely on the 'old faithfuls'-super-heated J21 class-to work these for the time being. These old-timers frequently work Saltburn and Richmond turns in company with 'A5's,' 'Ll's' and L.M.R. 2-6-4T's, and one recently worked the, 6.25 a.m. York slow from Bank Top and lost no time. Several drivers prefer these engines to the more modern types for many jobs in this area, they are easy to maintain, light on coal, and very comfortable in riding qualities. No. 45607 Fiji worked a Sheffield-Newcastle football excursion right through on 20.12.1952, leaving Bank Top at 11.40 a.m. Class 4 tanks Nos. 42083/4/5 are ail working in the Bank Top local passenger links. | SLS/195302 |
03/05/1964 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Awaiting Works at Scrap Yard: 44835, 45064, 48053, 48354, 48717, 70022. Awaiting Scrap at Scrap Yard: 42897, 42922, 48140, 48209. Diesel Erecting Shop: D277, D342, D349, D6843, 26005, 26034, 26048. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: D205, D210, D219, D241, D255, D274, D1582 painted, D1583, D1585 undercoat, D1609, D1610, D1611 shell only, 26047, 27006, 46457. Outside Erecting Shop: D254, 42081, 42410, 45080, 45112, 45217, 48528, 92156, 92177. Erecting Shop: D226, D248, D256, D315, D335, D336, D340, D1591 undercoat, D1592 nearly complete, D1593, D1594, D1595, D1596 motors mounted, D1597, D1598, D1599, D1600, D1601, D1602, D1603, D1604, D1605, D1606, D1607, D1608 shell only, D5719, D6789, D6794, D6884, D8050, 42055, 42085, 42394, 44665, 44873, 44884, 45132, 45147, 45182, 45336, 45354, 45415, 45647, 46436, 48211, 48258, 48313, 48424, 48746, 48749, 48759, 92026, 92030, 92085. Works Yard: 42583, 44662, 44872, 44898, 45000, 45271, 45558, 48070, 48171, 48371, 48462, 48538, 48602, 48613, 48684, 70010, 70024, 70049, 78002, 78007, 78017, 92062, 92102, 92126, 92154, 92166, 92227. Outside Paint Shop: D298, D1584 undercoat, D5717, D6775, D6863, D8002, D8027, 48742. Paint Shop: D1578 painted, D1579, D1580, D1581, D1586, D1587, D1588, D1589, D1590 undercoat, 26028. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/02/1951 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 42085 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Brighton (75A) |
||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
19/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) | ||
22/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
19/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
22/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
18/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (50G) | ||
25/05/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (50G) | ||
11/04/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
25/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
09/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Manningham (55F) | ||
20/05/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Normanton (55E) | ||
10/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42085 |