|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
13/04/1951 | Fairburn 2-6-4T\'s at Newhaven | It is reported that 42086/7 are now at Newhaven to take over turns previously worked by the 'Atlantics. | SLS/195105 |
16/11/1962 | Derby Works (Erecting Shop) | Diesel Erecting Shop: D4, D36, D58, D83, D91, D112, D121, D144, D191, D5010, D5023/87. Outside D.E. Shop : D5, D56, D114, D128, D5027. Test House: D5032, D5127. Outside Test House: D9, D115, D5005, Pullman uM60091. Shunter Test House : D2908. New Building : D165, D189, D192/3, D5186-5195. Finishing Shop: D74, D131, D188, D190, D5001/31. Erecting Shop: D87, D93, D118, D3126, 42087, 47326/38/78, 48395, 73011/6/25/46, 73136/41, 75003/14. Paint Shop: M.R. 1000 (Paintwork being touched up). Stone Pit: 47642, 48494, 75013. Foundry Row : D65, D81, 10000, 10202, 42500, 43496, 75056. Klondyke Sidings : ED6, ED7, D5145, D5400. Bone Yard : 10201/3, 42146. On Shed awaiting cut up : 40088. Ex Works on Shed: ED3, D2236 (5B), D2507 (6C), D5021 (1A), 43994, 47000, 73139. | SLS/196212 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/03/1951 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 42087 Built at Brighton Works Allocated to Brighton (75A) |
||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
30/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
15/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) | ||
17/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
18/07/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) | ||
05/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (14D) | ||
30/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) | ||
22/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) | ||
02/05/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bolton (9K) | ||
20/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) | ||
06/08/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) | ||
08/10/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42087 | ||
01/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |