30/09/1948 |
St. Rollox Works |
Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows: Nos. 40604 (3983) 27/8; 40647 (4368) 20/8; *40905 (3787) 17/8; 40908 (3780) 16/8; 41136 (3590) 15/8; 42421 26/8; 42877 (4332) 25/8; 42915 (4016) 30/8; 42918 (3947) 31/8; 44234 (3368) 13/8; 44281 (3415) 10/8; 45005 (9592) 1/9; 45047 (9716) 9/8; 45121 (9826) 22/8; 45455 (9668) 20/8; 45457 (9198) 22/8; 45474 (9820) 11/8; 45483 (9555) 2/9; 45499 (9101) 11/8; 45560 (9062) 6/8; 54446 (6065) 1/9; 54448 (6067) 19/8; 54464 (6170) 12/8; 54465 (6171) 1/9; 54473 (6200) 10/8; 54639 (2678) 18/8; 55164 15/8; 55221 23/8; 56025 19/8; 56155 30/8; 56276 2/9; 57271 (6034) 18/8; 57337 (975) 15/8; 57445 (1243) 3/9; 57453 (1326) 12/8; 57599 (1680) 9/8; *Retains L.M.S. on the tender. With the exception of Nos. 44234, 45047, 45560, 54464, 54639, 55164, 56276, and 57599, all of the foregoing are fitted with new smokebox number plates. In addition No. M5693 was re-numbered 45693 on 26/8, and No. 45692 (9710) and No. 57614 (1700) received new smokebox number plates on 20/8 and 23/8 respectively. No. 56025 went back into service as Works 'pug' on 20/8 and No. 16030 was towed away to Balornock shed on the same date. No. 55180, one of the engines in the Mail crash, was brought into the shops, ex dump, on 20/8, where it has since been cut-up; No. 5716, the other engine, is still in the dump |
SLS/194810 |
30/06/1949 |
Highland Section |
The few ex H.R.locomotives, now less than twenty, are not nowadays (apart from the 'Barney's' at Corkerhill) often seen south of Inverness or Forres. The one remaining 'Clan,' No. 54767 Clan Mackinnon, and the surviving 'Clan goods' put in most of their time on freight work on the 'Far North' road. Forres has the last 'Loch,' No. 14385, and a small 'Ben,' No. 14410. Another of the latter, No. 14409, does pilot work and odd jobs at Helmsdale, whilst the remaining three, Nos. 14398, 14399 an 54404, are at Wick and Thurso. The two small 0-4-4T's, Nos. 55051 an 55053, have both recently been repainted, with 'British Railways' on the tank sides. These work a week at a time on the Dornoch branch, the 'spare' engine being found at Helmsdale. 'Clan goods' No. 57955 has also been repainted. with 'British Railways' on the tender sides, as also have the 'Barney's,' Nos. 57695 an 57698, but the other renumbered locomotives, Nos. 54404, 54767, 57954 an 57956, are still lettered 'L.M.S.' Local traffic around Inverness is now handled by ex C.R. 4-4-0's, of which Nos. 14439, 54455/63/66/70/71, 14472, 54473/80/81, 14482, 54484, 14487, 54488/91, 14493/95 an 54496 are allocated to Inverness, Forres, Dingwall, etc. No. 54471 was noted at Dingwall, while No. 14472 was working the Black Isle branch train. Dunrobin has been sold, and it is understood to be destined for New Romney, Kent, although for what purpose is not known. |
SLS/194908 |
30/11/1949 |
Inverness Lochgorm Works |
Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 4789, 45136, 45478, 54473. |
SLS/195001 |
14/06/1952 |
Scottish Miscellany |
On a trip round the north, quite a variety of locomotives was noted, 55218 was on Aberfeldy Br., No. 44931 was pilot to 54500, 54494 on Up pass. at Murthly and 54467 at Pitlochry. No. 62262 was shunting at Elgin, 54473/82 at Forres, and at Inverness 54445/63/70/1/84 an 57634, 57954 an 73007. 55051 was at Dornoch and it is said locally that C.E. Dept. is to consider possibility of C.R. 0-4-4T as branch engine is getting worn-out. Helmsdale provided 54495, 57587 an 55053, the Dornoch Branch spare engine. Kyle of Lochalsh had only Class 5 LM 4-6-0. The early morning mixed train from Kyle to Dingwall is generally a LM 5MT, brake composite and a string of wagons. Bl, No. 61140 with self-weighing tender is due in Scotland for test purposes. 'Clan' Class engines have been noted working to Stirling and probably beyond. |
SLS/195208 |
31/07/1952 |
Keith MPD |
Engines at Keith shed were 62231, 62225/42/56/65/8/9/72/5, 61502/7/8, 67292, 54473 an 57597. |
SLS/195208 |