Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4397 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17803 Week
» 70819 Month
» 190346 Year
» 3217199 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Caledonian Railway |
935 |
y/e |
1916 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
14474 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
54474 |
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1916 |
31A |
|
St Rollox (Balornock) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
06/10/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
30/05/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1916 |
To Service |
To service as Caledonian Railway Number 935 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21449 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 14474 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Rollox (Balornock) (31A) |
|
|
20/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 54474 |
|
|
06/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 54474 |
|
|
02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick |
|
|