Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 32 Online
» 3926 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17969 Week
» 82923 Month
» 285587 Year
» 3312440 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2130 |
m/e |
06/1927 |
British Railways |
41948 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Whitelegg |
Class |
79 |
Company History |
LTSR/LMS |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 06/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 17/02/1959 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 8 mths , 17 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1927 |
13A |
|
Plaistow |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/02/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/02/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
04/10/1958 |
Plaistow Goods yard - stored locomotives |
41928/39/41/5/6/8/50/77/8/81/2/4/5/6/7/90/1/2/3. |
SLS/195811 |
06/03/1959 |
Over and Wharton branch |
One track of this short branch from Acton Bridge contains the LTS locos. shown as transferred to Spital Bridge (Peterboro') on 6th March 'condemned' in official lists viz. 41928/39/41/5/6/8/50/77/8/81-7/90-3, also ex LNWR 0-8-0s 48945, 49109/13/17/57/80, 49226/330/68. Another LTS loco, is at Badnall Wharf (between Norton Bridge and Standon Bridge) viz. 41936 along with 41078/156/724, 43419/631, 50646/725/57/77/818/31/55/65, 51424/53, 52399/517, 58066/196. |
SLS/195904 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2130 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 41948 |
|
|
17/02/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41948 |
|
|
02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|