Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 364 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18167 Week
» 71183 Month
» 190710 Year
» 3217563 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2156 |
m/e |
02/1930 |
British Railways |
41974 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Whitelegg |
Class |
79 |
Company History |
LTSR/LMS |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 02/1930 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/02/1955 |
Service Life |
25 yrs , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1955 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1930 |
13A |
|
Plaistow |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
29C |
|
Dundee West |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
20F |
|
Skipton |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
12/02/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
29C |
Dundee West |
w/e |
10/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
29C |
Dundee West |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
20F |
Skipton |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/02/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2156 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee West (29C) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 41974 |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Skipton (20F) |
|
|
02/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
12/02/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41974 |
|
|