Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4039 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17445 Week
» 70461 Month
» 189988 Year
» 3216841 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2159 |
m/e |
03/1930 |
British Railways |
41977 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Whitelegg |
Class |
79 |
Company History |
LTSR/LMS |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 03/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 17/02/1959 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 11 mths , 20 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1930 |
13C |
|
Tilbury |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/02/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/02/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/03/1950 |
Devons Road MPD |
In the Works' roads were: Nos. 40532 (ex Works), 43607, 44370, also Nos. 41939/51 (lined out and ? stored), 41928/29/41/45/66/68/76/77 an 2097. The crane tank-No. 58865-was in the shed and four 0-6-OT's were in evidence: Nos. M27510, 58853/58/61. |
SLS/195005 |
04/10/1958 |
Plaistow Goods yard - stored locomotives |
41928/39/41/5/6/8/50/77/8/81/2/4/5/6/7/90/1/2/3. |
SLS/195811 |
06/03/1959 |
Over and Wharton branch |
One track of this short branch from Acton Bridge contains the LTS locos. shown as transferred to Spital Bridge (Peterboro') on 6th March 'condemned' in official lists viz. 41928/39/41/5/6/8/50/77/8/81-7/90-3, also ex LNWR 0-8-0s 48945, 49109/13/17/57/80, 49226/330/68. Another LTS loco, is at Badnall Wharf (between Norton Bridge and Standon Bridge) viz. 41936 along with 41078/156/724, 43419/631, 50646/725/57/77/818/31/55/65, 51424/53, 52399/517, 58066/196. |
SLS/195904 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2159 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tilbury (13C) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 41977 |
|
|
17/02/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41977 |
|
|
02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|